Subscribe Now

# SSC CGL & MTS Quiz : Quantitative Aptitude | 16-10-2021

Swati Mahendras

As SSC CGL & MTS notification is out and candidates have started their preparation for this exam. Mahendras also has started special quizzes for this examination. This series of quizzes are based on the latest pattern of the SSC CGL & MTS  examination. Regular practice of the questions included in the quizzes will boost up your preparations and it will be very helpful in scoring good marks in the examination.

(1) A parallelogram ABCD has sides AB = 27 cm. and AD = 15 cm. The distance between the sides AB & DC is 10 cm. Find the distance between the sides AD and BC.

एक समान्तर चतुर्भुज ABCD की एक भुजा AB = 27 सेमी. और दूसरी भुजा AD = 15 सेमी. है। भुजाओं AB और DC के बीच की दूरी 10 सेमी. है। तद्नुसार भुजाओं AD और BC के बीच की दूरी ज्ञात कीजिये?

(A) 16 cm

(B) 18 cm

(C) 15 cm

(D) 17 cm

(2) 5.5 × 0.5 × 50.0 × 4 = ?

(A) 550.0

(B) 1000.100

(C) 1000.125

(D) 1000.125

(3) A man rows upstream a distance of 9 km or downstream a distance of 18 km taking 3 hours each time. Find the speed of the boat in still water.

एक आदमी उर्ध्वप्रवाह में 9 किमी की दूरी या अनुप्रवाह में 18 किमी. की दूरी तय करने में 3 घंटे लगते है तो नाव की शान्त जल में चाल ज्ञात कीजिए |

(A) 3.5 kmph

(B) 4.5 kmph

(C) 5.5 kmph

(D) 6.5 kmph

(4) Two trains running in opposite directions at 36 km/hr. and 45 km/hr. cross each other in 20 seconds. If one train is 200 m long, the length of the other train is:

दो ट्रेनें विपरीत दिशा से क्रमशः 36 किमी./घंटा और 45 किमी./घंटा की दर से एक दूसरे को 20 से. में पार करती है। यदि एक ट्रेन की लम्बाई 200 मी. है तो दूसरी ट्रेन की लम्बाई क्या है?

(A) 144 m.

(B) 200 m.

(C) 240 m.

(D) 250 m.

(5) X, Y, Z started a partnership business by investing Rs. 5,000 each. After 6 months 'Y' withdrew from the business and 'Z' added Rs. 5,000 to his investment. At the end of the year the total profit earned is Rs. 18,000. Find the share of 'Z' in the profit.

X, Y, Z प्रत्येक ने 5,000 रू. निवेश करके एक व्यापार शुरू किया। 6 माह के बाद 'Y' व्यापार से बाहर हो गया और 'Z' ने व्यापार में 5,000 रू. और निवेश किये। वर्ष के अन्त में कुल 18,000 रू. का लाभ हुआ। तो लाभ में 'Z' का हिस्सा ज्ञात कीजिए |

(A) Rs. 9000

(B) Rs. 6000

(C) Rs. 4500

(D) Rs. 3000

(6) What will be the unit's digit in the product of 159 × 22 × 453 × 35 × 68?

159 × 22 × 453 × 35 × 68 के गुणनफल में इकाई का अंक क्या होगा?

(A) 3

(B) 5

(C) 2

(D) 0

(7) A businessman marked the price of an article 20% above the cost price and allowed the purchaser 5% discount on the marked price thereby gained Rs. 8,400. Find the cost price of article.

एक व्यापारी अपनी वस्तुओं पर क्रय मूल्य से 20% अधिक अंकित करता है। और खरीदने वाले को 5% छूट देने के बाद भी 8,400 रू. का लाभ होता है। तो वस्तु का क्रय मूल्य ज्ञात कीजिए।

(A) Rs. 60000

(B) Rs. 75000

(C) Rs. 68400

(D) Rs. 78400

(8) A can do a work in 8 days, B can do in 6 days and C can do in 8 days. First A and B started the work. After 3 days they gave up the work and C was engaged to complete the work. How many days C takes to complete the remaining work?

A एक काम को 8 दिनों में कर सकता है B, 6 दिनों में कर सकता है और C, 8 दिनों में कर सकता है। पहले A और B काम शुरू करते है। 3 दिनों बाद वे काम छोड़ देते हैं और C ने अकेले काम को पूरा किया तो शेष काम पूरा करने में C को कितना समय लगा?

(A) 8 days

(B) 7 days

(C) 1 day

(D) 2 days

(9) The H.C.F and L.C.M of two numbers is 25 and 1050 respectively. If sum of those numbers is 575 then find the difference between them-

दो संख्याओं का म.स.तथा ल.स.क्रमशः 25 तथा 1050 है | यदि उन संख्याओं का योग 575 है तो उन संख्याओं में अन्तर है -

(A) 675

(B) 475

(C) 375

(D) 275

(10) 5/6 of a number is 28 more than ¾ of the number. By what should the number be multiplied to obtain a perfect square?

एक संख्या का 5/6 संख्या के 3/4 से 28 अधिक है। एक पूर्ण वर्ग प्राप्त करने के लिए संख्या को किस संख्या से गुणा किया जाना चाहिए?

(A) 31

(B) 21

(C) 32

(D) 24

Q-(1) Sol. (B)

Q-(2) Sol. (A)

5.5 × 0.5 × 50.0 × 4 = 550

Q-(3) Sol. (B)

Q-(4) Sol. (D)

Q-(5) Sol. (A)

Req. Ratio of their investment

= 5000 × 12: 5000 × 6: (5000 × 6 + 10000 × 6)

= 2: 1: 3

Q-(6) Sol. (D)

Unit digit in the product of 159 × 22 × 453 × 35 × 68

= Unit digit in the product of (9 × 2 × 3 × 5 × 8) = 0

Q-(7) Sol. (A)

Let cost price be Rs. x

Q-(8) Sol. (C)

Q-(9) Sol. (B)

Let first number = x

second number = y

then, x + y = 575 ... (i)

xy = 25 × 1050 ... (ii)

(x – y)
2= ( x + y )2– 4xy

= ( 575 )
2 – 4 × 1050 × 25

= 225625

x – y = 475

The required difference is 475.

Q-(10) Sol. (B)

Let the number be x.

According to the question,

Now, 336 = 2 × 2 × 3 × 2 × 2 × 7

Required number to be multiplied = 3 × 7 = 21